THE BENTLEY AND JOSEPH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance Religion and in particular Jewish religion and to advance the education of persons of the Jewish Faith in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 March 1980: Standard registration
- THE BENTLEY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON BENTLEY | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Esther Bentley | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
MR JOSH BENTLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.90k | £12.13k | £15.47k | £10.56k | £10.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.98k | £14.28k | £16.11k | £7.45k | £11.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 06 October 2023 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH JANUARY 1980
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR THE JEWISH RELIGION AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSNS OF THE JEWISH FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 GARRICK WAY
LONDON
NW4 1TA
- Phone:
- 0207 3178022
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window