Governing document FRIENDS OF WOODLANDS SCHOOL
Charity Number: 279504

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH SEPTEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED 16TH SEPTEMBER 1982, 24TH SEPTEMBER 1987, 23RD SEPTEMBER 1993, AND 21ST SEPTEMBER 1995 as amended on 16 Sept 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.