Trustees ROCKHAMPTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 279509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Henry Price Chair 22 January 2014
None on record
Sophie Elizabeth Williams Trustee 22 January 2025
None on record
Katie Lee Dent Trustee 22 January 2025
None on record
Jillian Elizabeth Bryant Mrs Trustee 08 November 2023
None on record
Michael Baily Trustee 24 October 2022
None on record
Sandra Goode Trustee 13 April 2016
None on record
SARAH CHILD Trustee
None on record
RICHARD CHILD Trustee
None on record