Deaf Choices UK Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Deaf Choices UK aspires to give deaf children improved access to: LANGUAGE by empowering their families to make fully informed choices. LITERACY, by supporting their educators to access information, training and resources. We provide knowledge information and training around the unique benefits, concepts and skills of using Cued Speech. Our offer supports deaf children and those with SEND.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- CUED SPEECH ASSOCIATION UK (Previous name)
- CUED SPEECH UK (Previous name)
- CUED SPEECH UK LIMITED (Previous name)
- NATIONAL CENTRE FOR CUED SPEECH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Hardy | Chair | 03 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Paul Twomey | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Henry-Macklin | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Celine Elumba-Hill | Trustee | 27 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gordon Bowman | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH GEORGE ORPIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.42k | £275.00k | £287.42k | £345.90k | £327.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £284.14k | £287.00k | £272.72k | £360.15k | £308.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH FEBRUARY 1980 AS AMENDED SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 JUNE 2000 & 28 SEPTEMBER 2002. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 OCT 2017 as amended on 06 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE DEVELOPMENT, STANDARDISATION, PROPAGATION, DISSEMINATION, TEACHING AND USE OF CUED SPEECH AS DESIGNED AND CONCEIVED BY DR ORIN CORNETT TO ENABLE THE DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED PEOPLE TO LEARN NOT ONLY LIP-READING IN ANY LANGUAGE BUT ALSO THE PARTICULAR LANGUAGE ITSELF. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Boatshed
Steamer Quay Road
Totnes
TQ9 5AL
- Phone:
- 01803712853
- Email:
- info@deafchoicesuk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window