Financial history CRIMPLESHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 279557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £4.92k £13.11k £2.21k £457 £283
Total expenditure £6.48k £1.87k £2.22k £2.39k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A