Maidenhead and Marlow Archaeology and History Society

Charity number: 279571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the society shall be the promotion of interest in all aspects of archaeology, history and related subjects, and research into the archaeological and historical heritage of Maidenhead and the surrounding area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,064
Total expenditure: £2,409

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Bracknell Forest
  • Reading
  • Slough
  • West Berkshire
  • Windsor And Maidenhead
  • Wokingham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 April 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MAIDENHEAD ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham Paul Seddon Chair 19 October 2018
FRIENDS OF COOKHAM ABBEY
Recently registered
Steven Leslie Breibart Trustee 19 May 2023
None on record
Keith David Abbott Trustee 28 January 2023
BERKSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Robert Thomas Evans Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Fiona Jane Tattersall Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Benjamin Mark Franklin Trustee 16 September 2022
None on record
Michael George Bryan Trustee 28 January 2022
FRIENDS OF COOKHAM ABBEY
Recently registered
Sarah Louise Seddon Trustee 04 December 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.54k £1.52k £790 £3.71k £4.06k
Total expenditure £1.86k £1.25k £1.21k £2.39k £2.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Vine Cottage
Stubbings Lane
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 6QN
Phone:
07976919681