Financial history THE BRITISH ENGINEERIUM TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 279579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £98 £37.44k £90.05k £91.89k £251.46k
Total expenditure £219.40k £113.72k £107.18k £128.01k £256.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A