BADGER'S FARM AND OLIVER'S BATTERY RESIDENTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of rooms for hire on a non profit making basis to local organisations thereby enabling a range of activities/interests for the benefit of the local comunity. Issuing a free comunity news letter informing local residents of items of interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £10,607 from 2 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
39 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 14 March 1980: Standard registration
- BF & OB RCA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janice Elizabeth Whittle | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jill Hare | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Mary Johnston | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Harris | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.11k | £95.37k | £144.61k | £111.13k | £104.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.26k | £71.59k | £78.61k | £103.68k | £98.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.61k | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.90k | £34.60k | £19.82k | £34.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 01 April 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 01 April 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 FEBRUARY 1980 AS AMENDED 4 JUNE 1987, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION, 20/10/2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BADGER FARM AND OLIVER'S BATTERY AND ADJACENT PARISHES AT WINCHESTER AND IN THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE (SUCH PARISHES HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE, AND TO MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
OLIVER'S BATTERY C. P. AND PARISHES AND WARDS AT WINCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Badger Farm Community Centre
Badger Farm Road
WINCHESTER
SO22 4QB
- Phone:
- 01962 868630
- Email:
- enquiries@bfobrca.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window