KESWICK HALL OLD STUDENTS' FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are old students of a College of Education. At present we issue cheques to old students in need. We also help needy members in other ways eg visiting them at home or in hospital, sending gifts e.g. flowers. We make an annual donation to Parkside School, College Road, Norwich to assist in the provision of facilities, to advance the children's education, not required to be provided by the LEA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 March 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GREG VARNEY | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL SEDDON | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY FARREN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £460 | £749 | £580 | £755 | £995 | |
|
Total expenditure | £530 | £765 | £967 | £1.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH MAY 1979 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST PAST STUDENTS AND MEMBERS OF STAFF OF NORWICH TRAINING COLLEGE OR OF KESWICK HALL COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, THEIR SPOUSES OR PARTNERS OR OTHER DEPENDENTS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT PARKSIDE SCHOOL, COLLEGE ROAD, NORWICH BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES (NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. SUPPORT TO OTHER INDIVIDUALS OR ORGANISATIONS MAY BE PROVIDED AS THE TRUSTEES AND MEMBERS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY APPROVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Fairhaven Court
Earlham Road
Norwich
NR2 3RX
- Phone:
- 01603501321
- Email:
- dandmj@waitrose.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window