Governing document ST THOMAS GARNET SCHOOL ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH JUNE 1979 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 OCTOBER 1999, 1 OCTOBER 2001, 13 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 27 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO CONDUCT CARRY ON ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY BOARDING OR DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS OR ANY ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS OF FURTHER EDUCATION FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WHOLLY OR MAINLY OF THE CATHOLIC RELIGION AND OF EITHER SEX OR BOTH SEXES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.