Financial history ST PANCRAS PARENTS TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 279612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £3.38k £1.05k £1.39k £7.42k £3.07k
Total expenditure £1.53k £2.27k £875 £8.00k £2.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A