Governance ST PANCRAS PARENTS TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 279612

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 28 March 1980: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 April 2012: Re-registered
- 10 January 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 23 April 2015: Re-registered
- 09 January 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 31 March 2017: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- THE FRIENDS OF ST PANCRAS SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.