THE SPHINX THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity Number: 279627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Theatre company with particular focus on encouraging women practitioners

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,200
Total expenditure: £10,787

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 March 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE WOMEN'S THEATRE GROUP LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSANNAH KRAFT LEVENE Chair 07 August 2013
None on record
Brigid Larmour Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Dr Paulette Randall MBE Trustee 14 March 2023
THE ROYAL THEATRICAL FUND
Received: On time
SUSAN MCGOUN Trustee 20 February 2023
None on record
DAME ROSEMARY SQUIRE Trustee 27 September 2022
None on record
JANE SEYMOUR Trustee
None on record
WINIFRED MARGARET SAXON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.01k £52.60k £92.35k £10.01k £10.20k
Total expenditure £43.33k £34.41k £88.21k £15.07k £10.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £44.10k £49.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 February 2022 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 February 2022 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
78 Lyford Road
London
SW18 3JW
Phone:
02036698210