Financial history THE ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL AND COLLEGE LEADERS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 279628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £80.54k £81.80k £73.29k £80.31k £203.25k
Total expenditure £86.51k £85.82k £74.24k £95.46k £100.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A