CROYDON MEDICAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medical & Dental Education for Hospital, General Practitioners and Dental Practitioners within the Croydon area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
Governance
- 14 April 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GITA MENON | Chair | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
DR SHEILA O'HARA | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES O'DONNELL | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAMES WILLIAM GILLGRASS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.97k | £9.12k | £25.50k | £18.03k | £15.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.90k | £330 | £1.08k | £740 | £25.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST JANUARY 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE BY WAY OF RESEARCH LECTURES AND DISCUSSIONS THE STUDY AND GENERAL KNOWLEDGE OF MEDICINE AND SCIENCE AND ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE PROGRESS AND DEVELOPMENT OF ALL BRANCHES OF MEDICINE SURGERY DENTISTRY AND VETERINARY MEDICINE FOR THE BENEFIT OF MANKIND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Croydon University Hospital
LONDON ROAD
CROYDON
SURREY
CR7 7YE
- Phone:
- 02084013840
- Email:
- npatel15@nhs.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window