Financial history THE WEST INDIAN ASSOCIATION OF SERVICE PERSONNEL (WASP)

Charity number: 279644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.60k £32.61k £29.53k £38.60k £37.61k
Total expenditure £47.24k £28.68k £27.31k £39.49k £43.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £4.75k N/A