CENTRE STAGE LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to mount at least two musical productions per year. Acting roles are open to anyone and are decided following auditions. We also offer on the job training in lighting, sound and other backstage jobs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 April 1980: Standard registration
- CENTRE STAGE (Working name)
- CENTRESTAGE (Working name)
- BT CENTRE STAGE (Previous name)
- THE BRITISH TELECOM LONDON LIGHT OPERA GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darcy Phillips | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Micayla Polon | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Garrood | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hewitt | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosie O'Rourke | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Hunter-Reid | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Navin Nair | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Brewin | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tal Hewitt | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALEXIS ROSE | Trustee | 16 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.93k | £4.67k | £17.11k | £58.06k | £97.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.24k | £1.38k | £26.11k | £60.74k | £88.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 133 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/02/1980 AS AMENDED ON 28/05/1985 AS AMENDED ON 20/08/2008 AS AMENDED ON 07/08/2015
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
80 Jeffreys Road
LONDON
SW4 6QP
- Phone:
- 07738936770
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window