WOMEN'S HEALTH CONCERN LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PRINCIPAL ACTIVITY IS A CONFIDENTIAL ADVICE LINE AND EMAIL ADVISORY SERVICE FOR WOMEN OF ALL AGES THROUGHOUT THE UK WHO SEEK INDEPENDENT, UNBIASED PROFESSIONAL INFORMATION ON GYNAECOLOGICAL, HORMONAL, SEXUAL HEALTH AND OTHER MEDICAL CONDITIONS. THE WEBSITE OFFERS AN INCREASINGLY WIDE RANGE OF INFORMATION. EVENTS AND WORKSHOPS ARE HELD FOR HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 May 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN CURTIS STEVENSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PATRICK SHERVINGTON MBE | Trustee | 01 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Sara Moger | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £538 | £407 | £1.96k | £212 | £892 | |
|
Total expenditure | £950 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2024 | 316 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/06/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/02/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/04/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE WOMEN SUFFERING FROM GYNAECOLOGICAL AND OBSTETRIC DISORDERS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN AND TO PROMOTE RESERACH INTO THESE DISORDERS AND TO PUBLISH ALL USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Womens Health Concern
The Barn
Dukes Place
MARLOW
Buckinghamshire
SL7 2QH
- Phone:
- 01628890199
- Email:
- admin@bms-whc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window