CUMNOR PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY

Charity number: 279672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Cumnor Pre-School Nursery provides sessional pre-school education for children aged 2 to 5.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £86,016
Total expenditure: £79,272

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 March 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Bond Chair 14 October 2023
None on record
Hanna Jenkins Trustee 26 November 2024
None on record
Sorrel Shamel-Wood Trustee 26 November 2024
None on record
Joe Dawson Trustee 26 November 2024
None on record
William Dix Trustee 05 October 2024
None on record
Erin Haines Trustee 05 October 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £103.71k £76.37k £88.91k £102.19k £86.02k
Total expenditure £84.42k £72.74k £74.84k £87.87k £79.27k
Income from government contracts £74.58k £59.12k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.15k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 April 2021 292 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 18 April 2021 292 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CUMNOR PRE SCHOOL
OXFORD ROAD
CUMNOR
OXFORD
OX2 9PQ
Phone:
01865864614