Horham Village Hall Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meetings, lectures, classes, social events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 16 July 1981: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- HORHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- HORHAM VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY RICHARD FRANK DEBENHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kerina Jane | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kay Smith Jeffrey | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie John Wilson | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maryann Cartwright | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Hambling | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Neil Douglas Cartwright | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|||||
STEVEN ANDREW HAVERS | Trustee | 24 July 2011 |
|
|||||
MRS M H STREETER | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR D WHATLING | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS KAREN ALDERTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.08k | £979 | £8.80k | £19.11k | £23.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.17k | £3.38k | £5.64k | £8.59k | £16.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £250 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LAND REGISTRY TRANSFER AND TRUST DEED DATED 11TH JULY 1978 as amended on 11 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HORHAM IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK WITHOUT DISTINICTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETING LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HORHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Doggetts Farm
New Street
Stradbroke
Eye
IP21 5JG
- Phone:
- 01379384869
- Email:
- m.streeter@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window