Financial history SOUTHEND AND DISTRICT ASSOCIATION FOR KIDNEY CARE

Charity Number: 279729
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2012 28/02/2013 28/02/2014 28/02/2015 28/02/2016
Total gross income £2.84k £360 £657 £29 £32
Total expenditure £13.01k £7.80k £1.76k £1.02k £7.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A