THE DARTINGTON HALL TRUST

Charity number: 279756
Charity reporting is up to date (235 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Dartington is a place of learning and experiment. We work locally, nationally and internationally to achive change in three crucial areas: the arts, the promotion of a fairer society and the future of our planet. Working with pioneering thinkers, teachers, artists and social entrepreneurs. Dartington helps people to address some of the significant issues of our time.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 1993: Standard registration
  • 12 September 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CRAFT EDUCATION (Working name)
  • DARTINGTON ARTS (Working name)
  • DARTINGTON INTERNATIONAL SUMMER SCHOOL (Working name)
  • HIGH CROSS HOUSE (Working name)
  • POLICY RESEARCH BUREAU (Working name)
  • RESEARCH IN PRACTICE (Working name)
  • SCHUMACHER COLLEGE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt Hon Lord David Triesman Chair 10 March 2023
None on record
David Charles Lovett Trustee 15 April 2025
None on record
Baroness Amanda Sater Trustee 24 May 2024
None on record
Peter Goldsbrough Trustee 19 June 2020
None on record
Rachel Cressida Watson Trustee 19 June 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £16.89m £20.06m £12.32m £14.97m £13.85m
Total expenditure £20.54m £24.33m £13.80m £19.52m £18.38m
Income from government contracts £3.45m N/A £4.21m £3.83m £750.00k
Income from government grants £34.33k £1.02m £264.97k £44.63k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.24m £886.00k £335.00k £161.00k £200.00k
Income - Other trading activities £6.07m £6.97m £3.53m £4.51m £5.32m
Income - Charitable activities £7.40m £10.24m £7.40m £9.61m £7.35m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.18m £1.97m £883.00k £604.00k £702.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £177.00k £76.00k £272.00k
Income - Legacies £67.00k £612.00k £239.00k £0 £52.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.66m £14.99m £9.46m £12.64m £12.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.19m £140.00k £26.00k £45.00k £68.00k
Expenditure - Governance £81.00k £140.00k £44.00k £63.00k £252.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £945.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.69m £9.19m £4.32m £6.83m £5.92m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £14.70m £18.05m £12.53m £12.11m £12.42m
Long-term investments £25.85m £16.90m £20.17m £20.13m £19.21m
Other assets £5.08m £8.59m £12.54m £8.47m £4.45m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£2.76m -£3.25m -£842.00k -£166.00k -£715.00k
Total liabilities £6.31m £6.19m £7.92m £7.88m £7.80m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 February 2025 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 20 February 2025 235 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 31 August 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 31 August 2021 62 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE SCHEMES TO PROVIDE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING COURSES OF INTERDISCIPLINARY STUDY INFORMED BY ECOLOGICAL AND SPIRITUAL VALUES AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE THE SCHUMACHER COLLEGE AND ITS SUCCESSOR BY WHATEVER NAME IT MAY BE KNOWN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 24 February 1993 : Standard registration
  • 12 September 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
The Dartington Hall Trust
The Elmhirst Centre
Dartington Hall
Totnes
TQ9 6EL
Phone:
01803847009