Financial history THORNFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 279758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £10.72k £11.49k £13.13k £15.87k
Total expenditure £0 £5.44k £6.60k £7.87k £19.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A £5.00k