Financial history STRATTON AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 279771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.99k £12.48k £4.29k £6.64k £6.64k
Total expenditure £3.41k £7.40k £10.17k £6.48k £6.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A