THE ISRAELI DANCE INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IDI'S PRINCIPAL ACTIVITIES ARE: RESEARCH & PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS; TRAINING FOR TEACHERS AND YOUTH LEADERS; CLASSES FOR ADULTS, YOUTH AND CHILDREN IN THE LONDON AREA; PERFORMING GROUPS WHICH PROVIDE A COMMUNITY OUTREACH FUNCTION, INTRODUCING MANY THOUSANDS OF PEOPLE EACH YEAR TO THE VIBRANT NATURE OF ISRAELI AND JEWISH DANCE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 April 1980: Standard registration
- 24 October 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 24 October 2024: Funds transferred to 1206015 THE ISRAELI DANCE INSTITUTE
- IFDI (Working name)
- ISRAEL DANCE INSTITUTE (Working name)
- ISRAEL FOLK DANCE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE ISRAEL FOLK DANCE INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.99k | £76.01k | £107.11k | £101.15k | £122.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.19k | £72.70k | £81.36k | £119.61k | £128.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.94k | £21.13k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MARCH 1980 AS AMENDED 3 MARCH 1992 AND 5 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ISRAELI AND JEWISH FOLK DANCES AND SONGS BY MEANS OF TEACHING, DEMONSTRATIONS AND OTHER SUITABLE METHODS. (B) TO PROVIDE AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH INTO - AND STUDY OF - THE ORIGINS, DEVELOPMENT AND PRACTICE OF ISRAELI AND JEWISH FOLK DANCES AND TO PUBLISH ALL USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window