THE GIRLS' BRIGADE INTERNATIONAL COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The support and encouragement of the individual Fellowships and their member countries in the outworking of the Charity's objects as contained in the Trustees Annual Report. To become a more mission oriented organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- American Samoa
- Anguilla
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Australia
- Bermuda
- Botswana
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Cambodia
- Canada
- Cayman Islands
- Cook Islands
- Dominica
- Eswatini
- Ghana
- Guernsey
- Haiti
- Hong Kong
- Ireland
- Jamaica
- Jersey
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Montserrat
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Northern Ireland
- Papua New Guinea
- Philippines
- Romania
- Saint Vincent
- Scotland
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Maarten
- Solomon Islands
- South Africa
- St Kitts And Nevis
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- United States
- Vanuatu
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 16 April 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASELLAH PRISCILLA PENNY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kaylene Ruth Trembath | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amelia Margaret Heaford | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Shaw | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Quindell Elizabeth Ferguson | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
BETTY ANNE MCCOMB | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Aruk Okon Omori | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.34k | £33.69k | £3.97k | £20.61k | £20.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.85k | £25.95k | £16.06k | £18.82k | £24.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12TH NOVEMBER 1979, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 7 JULY 1998 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 7 SEPTEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EXTEND AND MAINTAIN THE CHRISTIAN BELIEF AND BEHAVIOUR IN PRIMARILY GIRLS. THIS IS DONE THROUGH THE FORMATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF LOCAL COMPANY GROUPS AND OTHER INITIATIVES. THE PURPOSE OF THIS WORK IS TO TRAIN MEMBERS TO FOLLOW THE STANDARD SET BY JESUS CHRIST AND TO PROVIDE POSITIVE CHRISTIAN TEACHING REGARDING LIFE ISSUES FACING THEM IN THEIR GROWING AND ADULT LIVES.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cliff College
Calver
Hope Valley
S32 3XG
- Phone:
- 01246582322
- Email:
- HOME@GBWORLDWIDE.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window