Financial history RAMGARHIA SABHA SOUTHALL

Charity number: 279814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £519.79k £310.21k £451.80k £512.68k £601.30k
Total expenditure £510.35k £195.49k £160.58k £337.91k £497.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £70.75k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £402.75k N/A N/A £377.90k £433.87k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £25.23k N/A N/A £63.53k £55.64k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £91.80k N/A N/A £71.25k £111.79k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £119.74k N/A N/A £301.46k £426.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds £351.98k N/A N/A £27.07k £62.24k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £9.35k £0
Expenditure - Other £38.62k N/A N/A £9.39k £8.78k