RAMGARHIA SABHA SOUTHALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sikh Religious organisation provides religious, educational, cultural, Sports and Community development services in the Southall(West London) Area. It also provides relief for poverty within community and supports relief efforts in the event of disasters around the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£601,300
Donations and legacies | £433.87k | |
Charitable activities | £55.64k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £111.79k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£497,547
Raising funds | £62.24k | |
Charitable activities | £426.53k | |
Other | £8.78k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £71.02k | |
Charitable expenditure | £426.53k | |
Retained for future use | £103.75k |
People

5 Employee(s)
26 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ealing
Governance
- 30 April 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOGA SINGH JUTLEY President | Chair | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
MANJINDER SINGH DEVGON Vic. Pre | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manjit Singh Sian Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaspal Singh JUTLEY Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avtar Kaur PANESAR Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avtar Singh Rehinsi Exe Mem | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Narinder Singh Chana Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jasbir Singh Ubhi Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kuldip Singh Sehmi Treasurer | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bakhshish Singh Panesar Asst Sect | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaswinder Singh BHACHU Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jagjit Singh JHITA Library | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kewal Singh Dhiman Ast.Treas | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ravinder Singh Kundi Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaswant Singh Rayet Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
BALBIR SINGH GAHIR Jathedar | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
NIRMAL SINGH BHACHU Ast.Store | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manjit Singh Jutla Exe Memb | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
DHARAM SINGH BHOGAL STORE | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Salinder Singh Sohal Gen Sect | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paramjit Singh Bhambra Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tarlochan Kaur Sagoo Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bhalvinder Singh Virdee Hold Trust | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Surinder Singh Sahans Hold Trust | Trustee | 12 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEWAL SINGH SAHOTA Hold Trust | Trustee | 12 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
SANTOKH SINGH UBHI Hold Trust | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £519.79k | £310.21k | £451.80k | £512.68k | £601.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £510.35k | £195.49k | £160.58k | £337.91k | £497.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £70.75k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £402.75k | N/A | N/A | £377.90k | £433.87k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £25.23k | N/A | N/A | £63.53k | £55.64k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £91.80k | N/A | N/A | £71.25k | £111.79k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £119.74k | N/A | N/A | £301.46k | £426.53k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £351.98k | N/A | N/A | £27.07k | £62.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £9.35k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £38.62k | N/A | N/A | £9.39k | £8.78k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.58m | N/A | N/A | £3.36m | £3.35m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £3.46m | £3.46m | |
|
Other assets | £408.34k | N/A | N/A | £737.99k | £844.38k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £12.92k | N/A | N/A | £2.40k | £2.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
22 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2020 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2020 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 MARCH 1980, ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 14 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 JANUARY 2006 as amended on 26 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH RELIGION. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE TRUST DEED 10TH MARCH 1980. (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. (D) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AS AFORESAID AND QUALIFIED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ramgarhia Sabha Trust
53-57 Oswald Road
SOUTHALL
Middlesex
UB1 1HN
- Phone:
- 02085745635
- Email:
- admin@ramgarhia.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window