Governing document RAMGARHIA SABHA SOUTHALL

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 MARCH 1980, ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 14 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 JANUARY 2006 as amended on 26 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH RELIGION. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE TRUST DEED 10TH MARCH 1980. (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. (D) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AS AFORESAID AND QUALIFIED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.