Trustees RAMGARHIA SABHA SOUTHALL
Charity number: 279814

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOGA SINGH JUTLEY President | Chair | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
MANJINDER SINGH DEVGON Vic. Pre | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manjit Singh Sian Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaspal Singh JUTLEY Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avtar Kaur PANESAR Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avtar Singh Rehinsi Exe Mem | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Narinder Singh Chana Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jasbir Singh Ubhi Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kuldip Singh Sehmi Treasurer | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bakhshish Singh Panesar Asst Sect | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaswinder Singh BHACHU Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jagjit Singh JHITA Library | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kewal Singh Dhiman Ast.Treas | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ravinder Singh Kundi Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaswant Singh Rayet Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
BALBIR SINGH GAHIR Jathedar | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
NIRMAL SINGH BHACHU Ast.Store | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manjit Singh Jutla Exe Memb | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
DHARAM SINGH BHOGAL STORE | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Salinder Singh Sohal Gen Sect | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paramjit Singh Bhambra Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tarlochan Kaur Sagoo Exe Member | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bhalvinder Singh Virdee Hold Trust | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Surinder Singh Sahans Hold Trust | Trustee | 12 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEWAL SINGH SAHOTA Hold Trust | Trustee | 12 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
SANTOKH SINGH UBHI Hold Trust | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.