Trustees CHARLTON RECREATIONAL CENTRE
Charity number: 279819

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorian John James | Chair | 14 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Steele | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rohan Koenig | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Rawlings | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Collins | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Susan Hobbs | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Brooks | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Medland | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Walker | Trustee | 01 January 1984 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.