OTTERSHAW PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 279833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising for the benefit of the children within the schools

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £28,170
Total expenditure: £53,042

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • OPTA (Working name)
  • OTTERSHAW PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
  • OTTERSHAW PARENTS, TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jenifer Hoy Trustee 30 September 2024
None on record
Finola O'Duffy Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £21.24k £15.14k £22.92k £22.95k £28.17k
Total expenditure £37.11k £18.63k £8.53k £25.37k £53.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 15 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 August 2023 14 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 02 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ottershaw C of E Infant School
Fletcher Close
Ottershaw
CHERTSEY
KT16 0JT
Phone:
07983623394