LETCHWORTH AND BALDOCK DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity fosters the aims of The Scout Association to help young people achieve their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potential as individuals, as responsible citizens and as Members of their local, national and international communities. The Scouting method is to give young people the opportunity to 'learn by doing' in partnership with adults.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 30 April 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Malone | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Read | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clair Calver | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Aird | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan James Mann | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Russell Paul Wake | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Coldrey | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Grosvenor Tyler | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth George Osborne | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
George Robert Muge | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY PALMER | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Adam Grosvenor Tyler | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Wendy Tierney | Trustee | 04 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
APRYL GOODWIN | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY CROXFORD | Trustee | 22 October 2012 |
|
|||||
PHILIP CHARSLEY | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN DURRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER KING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.17k | £84.31k | £32.61k | £45.88k | £84.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.47k | £40.76k | £51.56k | £45.22k | £93.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £600 | £10.00k | £12.31k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2024 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
19 June 2024 | 232 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Kingsfield House
Hadrian Way
BALDOCK
SG7 6FR
- Phone:
- 01462895665
- Email:
- treasurer@lbdscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window