THE PUTNEY PARISH DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 279868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The restoration, development and maintenance of the churches of St Mary's and All Saints' in the Parish of Putney.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ALL SAINTS RESTORATION FUND (Working name)
  • THE ST MARY'S PUTNEY AND THE CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS RESTORATION AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
  • THE ST MARY'S PUTNEY RESTORATION AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JOHN WHITTAKER Chair 01 September 2018
MILES TRUST FOR THE PUTNEY AND ROEHAMPTON COMMUNITY
Received: On time
THE BIGGS-WYMONDESOLD TRUST
Received: On time
ST MARY'S PARISH TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ALL SAINTS' PUTNEY
Received: On time
ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHARITY
Received: On time
PEST HOUSES FUND
Received: On time
PUTNEY RELIEF COMMITTEE
Received: On time
Richard John Holman FCA Trustee
NIND'S WANDSWORTH CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE BIGGS-WYMONDESOLD TRUST
Received: On time
THE MARTIN LUTHER KING MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE NORA AND OLIVE BREWER MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAULINE MEETINGS
Received: 44 days late
Putney United Gospel Society
Received: On time
ST NAZAIRE RAID MEMORIAL TRUST
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ALL SAINTS' PUTNEY
Received: On time
TOGETHER FOR THE COMMON GOOD
Received: On time
GERALD ALLISON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £6 £0 £24 £0
Total expenditure £3.53k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 GENOA AVENUE
LONDON
SW15 6DY
Phone:
02087890953
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available