STAUNTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 279881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing facilities for social and entertainment activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,198
Total expenditure: £3,964

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 April 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicci Elizabeth Morgan Trustee 27 March 2024
None on record
Andrew William Davis Trustee 31 August 2023
None on record
Helen Jennifer Carter Trustee 21 March 2023
None on record
Barbro Ingrid Margareta Fox Trustee 21 February 2023
None on record
Neil Bevan Trustee 21 February 2023
None on record
Paul David Mobbs-Morgan Trustee 22 June 2021
None on record
RAYMOND GEOFFREY HEDGES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.41k £10.01k £2.20k £3.27k £5.20k
Total expenditure £7.56k £7.15k £3.27k £3.71k £3.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 February 2024 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Maple Tree House
Reddings Lane
Staunton
COLEFORD
Gloucestershire
GL16 8NZ
Phone:
07910168883
Website:

No information available