Trustees STAUNTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 279881

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicci Elizabeth Morgan | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Davis | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jennifer Carter | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbro Ingrid Margareta Fox | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Bevan | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Mobbs-Morgan | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND GEOFFREY HEDGES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.