THE CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Chartered Society of Physiotherapy Charitable Trust supports the advancement of education and research in subjects relevant to the practice of physiotherapy and kindred forms of treatment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £501.56k | £183.11k | £217.05k | £114.50k | £136.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £689.02k | £805.99k | £401.04k | £595.34k | £304.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £338.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £163.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £689.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 March 2024 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 March 2024 | 148 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 February 2024 | 473 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 February 2024 | 473 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/03/1980 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 13/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 08/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06/01/2012 as amended on 18 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF HUMAN SUFFERING AND THE PROTECTION OR PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEATLH NY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN SUBJECTS RELEVANT TO THE PRACTICE OF PHYSIOTHERAPY AND KINDRED FORMS OF TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window