Governing document THE CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity Number: 279882
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/03/1980 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 13/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 08/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06/01/2012 as amended on 18 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF HUMAN SUFFERING AND THE PROTECTION OR PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEATLH NY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN SUBJECTS RELEVANT TO THE PRACTICE OF PHYSIOTHERAPY AND KINDRED FORMS OF TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.