THE COGGESHALL COMMUNITY SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Swimming facilities for lessons and general public use
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 14 May 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Wilson | Chair | 20 October 2016 |
|
|||||||
Lisa Calvert | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Edward Pink | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Kate Robertson | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dennis Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
TINA LOUISE KEMBLE | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.72k | £84.55k | £88.19k | £125.54k | £119.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.51k | £85.42k | £73.65k | £91.15k | £89.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2023
(These accounts |
17 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 September 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 26 September 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH MARCH 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A SWIMMING POOL AT COGGESHALL FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF LOCAL SCHOOLS AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL INHABITANTS OF THE AREA IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITHE THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
COGGESHALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Honywood Community Science School
Honeywood Avenue
Coggeshall
Colchester
CO6 1PZ
- Phone:
- 01376564716
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window