HASLEMERE AND DISTRICT HOSPITAL VOLUNTARY AID FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to hospitals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 June 1980: Standard registration
- 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £806 | £687 | £426 | £330 | |
|
Total expenditure | £844 | £176 | £281 | £176 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 30 September 2008 | 243 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 17 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 17 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 15 February 2006 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH MAY 1980
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HASLEMERE AND DISTRICT HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window