Accounts and annual returns WINNERSH WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 279951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required