THE ROMFORD GREYHOUND OWNERS ASSOCIATION TRUST FOR RETIRED RACING GREYHOUNDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The R.G.O.A. Trust cares for and homes greyhounds for owners of greyhounds that raced at Romford Greyhound when their racing careers are over. The retired greyhounds enter our rented kennels, they are fed & exercised and generally cared for until they can be homed. By advertising in newspapers, notice boards, website etc, we invite the public to visit our kennels and select a suitable greyhound.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Havering
Governance
- 14 May 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR DOUG HAYES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mark Elks | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary West | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £529.31k | £62.51k | £79.26k | £76.05k | £60.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.77k | £104.44k | £112.88k | £106.17k | £102.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £515.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £8.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £98.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £937 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 03 July 2024 | 307 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 03 July 2024 | 307 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 12 May 2021 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 12 May 2021 | 254 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH APRIL 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE CARE AND PROTECTION BY MEANS OF TEMPORARY SHELTER AND SUITABLE HOMES FOR GREYHOUNDS WHOSE RACING LIFE HAS BEEN TERMINATED BY THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY, INJURY, DISEASE OR OTHER SUFFICIENT REASON AND WHOSE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES CANNOT BE SATISFIED BY THEIR OWNERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 Western Road
BILLERICAY
Essex
CM12 9DT
- Phone:
- 07932033088
- Email:
- RGOAchairman@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window