BLAKENEY VILLAGE HALL AND PAVILION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the trust is the provision and maintenance of Blakeney Village Hall. This is achieved by the hiring out of the hall and the running of a bar as an adjacent to certain hirings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 October 1980: Standard registration
- BLAKENEY VILLAGE HALL TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Armstrong | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Jardine | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Baughan | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edward Hackford | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Millward | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH BARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.17k | £20.72k | £34.78k | £30.97k | £19.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.88k | £10.41k | £15.47k | £30.13k | £27.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.06k | £17.52k | £894 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 MARCH 1980 AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 17 APRIL 2001.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND OR PLAYING FIELD AND FACILITIES ANCILLARY THERETO AND IF THE COMMITTEE THINK FIT A VILLAGE HALL AND PAVILION FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BLAKENEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BLAKENEY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blakeney Village Hall
Langham Road
Blakeney
NR25 7PG
- Phone:
- 01263 741158
- Email:
- bvhrichard@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window