Trustees BLAKENEY VILLAGE HALL AND PAVILION TRUST
Charity Number: 279969

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Armstrong | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Jardine | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Baughan | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edward Hackford | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Millward | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH BARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.