THE ALCONBURY RECREATION FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's activities involve the provision, maintenance and delivery of recreational facilities for the local community in the Alconburys and surrounding villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 15 May 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Damion Lewis | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Chris Kirschner | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christian Lee Bodley | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Staines | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Watson | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Adams | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.47k | £42.55k | £71.03k | £65.62k | £54.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.14k | £38.91k | £74.10k | £56.98k | £85.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £9.97k | £23.37k | £5.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 3RD APRIL 1980 AS AMENDED 21ST AUGUST 1984
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND AND, IF THE COMMITTEE THINK FIT, OF A PAVILION OR SIMILAR BUILDING FOR USE IN CONNECTION WITH SUCH RECREATION GROUND FOR USE, IN PARTICULAR FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ALCONBURY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ALCONBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALCONBURY RECREATION FIELD
ALCONBURY SPORTS & SOCIAL
GREAT NORTH ROAD
ALCONBURY
HUNTINGDON
PE28 4EX
- Phone:
- 01480891313
- Email:
- enquiries.assc@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window