Financial history WELWYN HATFIELD TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 280003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £277 £6 £81 £753 £1.89k
Total expenditure £1.27k £382 £1.50k £601 £2.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A