WELWYN HATFIELD TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 280003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A charity organisation that record selected extracts from the Welwyn & Hatfield Times on to CD for blind, partially sighted people, and those who have difficulty in reading due to temporary or permanent incapacity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,888
Total expenditure: £2,789

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WHATNEWS! (Working name)
  • WHATNEWS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HILARY WITHERS Chair
None on record
Andrew John Barker Trustee 10 August 2020
None on record
Robert Handscomb Trustee 26 May 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £277 £6 £81 £753 £1.89k
Total expenditure £1.27k £382 £1.50k £601 £2.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Cubitts Close
WELWYN
AL6 0DZ
Phone:
07710177271