JOHN GOLDING HOUSE

Charity number: 280010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Housing/Accomodation

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £35,956
Total expenditure: £29,112

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • JOHN GOLDING TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE INDUSTRIAL DWELLINGS SOCIETY (1885) LTD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.82k £30.17k £31.54k £32.74k £35.96k
Total expenditure £29.83k £24.44k £23.34k £23.44k £29.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 04 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 June 2024 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 June 2024 138 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED ON 18 MARCH 1977
Charitable objects
FOR THE ALTERATION CONVERSION REBUILDING MAINTENANCE UPKEEP FURNISHING OR CARRYING ON OF JOHN GOLDING HOUSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 14 May 1980 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
co The Industrial Dwellings Society
143 Stoke Newington Road
LONDON
N16 8BP
Phone:
02088009606
Website:

No information available