COLDFALL SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 280012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parent Teacher Association primarily involved in fundraising for the school

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 September 2023

Total income: £56,017
Total expenditure: £22,162

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF COLDFALL (Working name)
  • GOLDFALL SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie Rankin Trustee 22 April 2025
None on record
Jennifer Kate Martin Trustee 19 October 2024
None on record
Rachael Mooney Trustee 19 October 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/09/2019 05/09/2020 05/09/2021 05/09/2022 05/09/2023
Total gross income £33.78k £23.32k £19.04k £72.08k £56.02k
Total expenditure £26.34k £23.85k £6.38k £27.27k £22.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 September 2023 19 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2023 19 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 September 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 05 September 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2020 10 August 2021 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Coldfall Primary School
Coldfall Avenue
London
N10 1HS
Phone:
02088830608
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available