1ST STEBBING SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 280028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing scouting in Stebbing and the surrounding area for young people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,152
Total expenditure: £3,806

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 April 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD LINCOLN Chair
None on record
Nieky Van Veggel Trustee 21 June 2024
None on record
Matthew Breeze Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record
Catherine Frost Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record
Daniel Harris Trustee 01 February 2017
None on record
Aedin Lipski Trustee 21 June 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.53k £639 £2.02k £6.61k £6.15k
Total expenditure £8.04k £1.07k £2.71k £9.30k £3.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 MARSHALLS PIECE
STEBBING
DUNMOW
CM6 3RZ
Phone:
01371856117
Website:

No information available